Committee on Accreditation (CoA)
Charge
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
To be responsible for the execution of the accreditation program of ALA, and to develop and formulate standards of education for library and information studies for the approval of council.
Roster
Denice C. Adkins
(Member, July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2026)
Selinda Berg
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2028)
Dr. Pauletta Brown Bracy
(Member, July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2026)
Dr. Andrea J. Copeland
(Member, April 1, 2023, to June 30, 2028)
Lloyd Kaufman
(Member, March 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Ms. Iris M. Lee
(Member, July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2026)
Dr. Anne Cooper Moore
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2028)
Lisa O'Connor
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2028)
Dr. Joe O. Sanchez
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2027)
Amy Spence Lappin
(Executive Board Liaison, July 1, 2023, to July 31, 2025)
Linda Lysoby
(Primary Staff Liaison, December 1, 2023, to June 30, 2050)
Melissa K. Walling
(Staff Liaison, July 8, 2024, to June 30, 2050)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2025. Last retrieved on 09/18/2024. Refresh now.
Resources
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
Please contact the Office at accred@ala.org instead of individual volunteer members of the Committee.
Composition
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
Twelve (12) Members, which includes a chairperson appointed annually:
- Two (2) Public Members with two-year, staggered terms (may be renewed once)
- Eight (8) ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵMembers with four-year, staggered terms (non-renewable)
- One (1) Canadian Member with a four-year, staggered term (non-renewable)
- One (1) designated Dean/Director position, with a four-year, staggered term (non-renewable) made by the ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵappointing officer from a list of recommendations made by the ALISE Council of Deans and Directors
Subcommitees and Task Forces
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
Twelve (12) Members, which includes a chairperson appointed annually:
- Two (2) Public Members with two-year, staggered terms (may be renewed once)
- Eight (8) ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵMembers with four-year, staggered terms (non-renewable)
- One (1) Canadian Member with a four-year, staggered term (non-renewable)
- One (1) designated Dean/Director position, with a four-year, staggered term (non-renewable) made by the ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵappointing officer from a list of recommendations made by the ALISE Council of Deans and Directors
Interim Director, Office for Accreditation
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
Linda Lysoby
Interim Director, Office for Accreditation