ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵBylaws Committee
Charge
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
To consider amendments to the ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵbylaws; to review and draft rules for the conduct of council and membership meetings; to review and draft rules for the preparation of resolutions, memorials, and tributes; and to make recommendations to the association in accordance with the provisions of the ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵbylaws.
Roster
Mr. Brian E. C. Schottlaender
(Chair, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024)
Emily Daly
(Member, July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2024)
Mr. H J. Pedelty
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Mark D. Robison
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Mr. Brian E. C. Schottlaender
(Member, July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2024)
Cara B. Stone
(Member, July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2024)
Dr. Peter D. Hepburn
(Executive Board Liaison, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Mr. David I. Stokes
(Committee Associate, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Sheryl Reyes
(Staff Liaison, July 1, 2018, to July 1, 2035)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2023. Last retrieved on 09/18/2024. Refresh now.
Composition
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
On recommendation of Council, February, 1958, the Constitution and Bylaws Committee is to consist of five members. Chairperson to be appointed annually. Charge revised at the 1995 Midwinter Meeting by ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵCouncil.
Subcommitees and Task Forces
ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵ
On recommendation of Council, February, 1958, the ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵBylaws Committee is to consist of five members. Chairperson to be appointed annually. Charge revised at the 1995 Midwinter Meeting by ÂÜÀòÍøÊÓƵCouncil.